Goldberg, Robert Joshua (CPSO#: 93075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke Medical Centre
85 The East Mall, Suite 400
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone: 416-621-2220
Fax: 416-621-2203
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing, 1st Floor, Room 442
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-5800 Ext. 6361
Fax: 416-603-5210
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site,100 Queensway West
Diabetes Management Centre, 2nd Flr
Clinical and Administrative Bldg.
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 905-848-7545
Fax: 905-804-7955
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. Goldberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goldberg ( CPSO# 93075 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke Medical Centre
85 The East Mall
Suite 400
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone Number: (416) 621-2220

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOSHUA GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014