Goldfarb, David R (CPSO#: 55729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: Goldfarb, David Ralph (used until: 17 Jun 1986 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
685 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6
Phone: (416) 499-5558
Fax: (416) 499-9392
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David R. Goldfarb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Goldfarb ( CPSO# 61117 )
Dr. D. Goldfarb ( CPSO# 55729 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 499-5558

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7

Business Address:
402 - 685 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 499-5558

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID R GOLDFARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDFARB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1987