Goldhamer, Paul Morton (CPSO#: 28408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
164 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 510
Toronto ON  M4P 1G4
Phone: (416) 926-0799
Fax: (416) 538-8513
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Fax: (416) 586-8654
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul M Goldhamer & Dr. Michelle Farine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Goldhamer ( CPSO# 28408 )
Dr. M. Farine ( CPSO# 53304 )

Business Address:
Suite 510
164 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1G4
Phone Number: (416) 926-0799

Business Address:
Suite 305
2238 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 538-8512

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
9th Floor Room 964
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL MORTON GOLDHAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDHAMER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Mar 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1983