Goldman, Adam Zale (CPSO#: 96914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Durham Family Health Team
Building E, Suite 200B
1105 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 420-9999
Fax: (905) 420-0863
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Appletree Medical Centre
Unit 15
1 Rossland Road West
Ajax ON  L1Z 1Z2
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-9880
Fax: (905) 426-3196
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Carea Community Health Centre
360 Bayly Street West
Unit #5
Ajax ON  L1S 1P1
Canada
Phone: (905) 428-1212
Fax: (905) 428-9151
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM ZALE GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2013