Goldman, Marvin Ben (CPSO#: 19890)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical records prior to 2012 may contact RSRS: 1-888-563-3732. Patients seeking their medical record from 2012 onwards should contact the Albany Clinic, 807 Broadview Ave, Toronto, ON M4K 2P8.
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 12 Mar 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018