Goldsman, Frank Barry (CPSO#: 55614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5100 De Maisonneuve West. suite 710
Westmount QC  H4A 3T2
Phone: (514) 938-0656
Fax: (514) 938-1211

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: 4427 Sherbrooke West Westmount QC H3Z 1E5
Date Received: 10 Aug 2011


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Goldsman PO Box 33 Succursale Victoria Westmount, Quebec H3Z 2T1
Date Received: 08 Sep 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK BARRY GOLDSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986