Goldstein, Benjamin Israel (CPSO#: 76216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Avenue
EG48
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5328
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Goldstein ( CPSO# 76216 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Director, Centre for Youth Bipolar Disorder
2075 Bayview Avenue -Room EG48
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5328

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN ISRAEL GOLDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2009