Goldstein, Mark David (CPSO#: 83279)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Jacobs Pain Centre
SUITE 102, 8920 WOODBINE AVE
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone: (905) 305-9484
Fax: (905) 305-7381
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouville Urgent Care
110 Copper Creek Dr, Suite 100
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Canada
Phone: 905-472-8911
Fax: 9054726081
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

OATC Vanier
263 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1L 6C4
Canada
Phone: (613) 749-9666
Fax: 613-749-4555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

CBI Assessment Services
1457 McCowan Road #214
Scarborough ON  M1S 5K7
Canada
Phone: (416) 444-4100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CBI Assessment Services
10720 Yonge St Suite #223
Richmond Hill ON  L4C3C9
Canada
Phone: 9058832236
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

13291 YONGE ST SUITE 302
Richmond Hill ON  L4E4L6
Canada
Phone: 9058832555
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Ontario Addiction Treatment Centre
45 Bloor Street East, Unit 2
Oshawa ON  L1H 3L9
Canada
Phone: (905) 443-0223
Fax: (905) 443-0225
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Oatc Ottawa Clinic
401 Somerset St W
Ottawa ON  K2P 0K1
Canada
Phone: (613) 233-1114
Fax: (613) 233-1141
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

OATC OTTAWA WEST
1318 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K8
Canada
Phone: (613) 627-0856
Fax: (613) 715-9174
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

OATC LONGLAC
92 Indian Road
Longlac ON  P0T 2A0
Canada
Phone: (807) 876-9666
Fax: (807) 876-9777
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark D. Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goldstein ( CPSO# 83279 )

Business Address:
102 - 8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9W9
Phone Number: (905) 305-9484

Business Address:
100 - 110 Copper Creek Boulevard
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-8911

Business Address:
401 Somerset Street West
Ottawa ON  K2P 0K1
Phone Number: (613) 627-0856

Business Address:
92 Indian Road
Longlac ON  P0T 2A0
Phone Number: (807) 876-9666

Business Address:
45 Bloor Street East
Unit 2
Oshawa ON  L1H 3L9
Phone Number: (905) 443-0223

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID GOLDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007