Golomb, Meredith Rose (CPSO#: 74302)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Feb 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Feb 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Harvard Medical School, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 20 Feb 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Feb 2002