Golrokhian Sani, Mohammad Reza (CPSO#: 97179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Dec 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Farsi

Education:Shiraz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Port Arthur Health Clinic
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807)346-1000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reza Golrokhian Sani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Golrokhian Sani ( CPSO# 97179 )

Business Address:
Port Arthur Health Clinic
194 Courth Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 23 Dec 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 25 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Mohammad Reza Golrokhian Sani may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Otolaryngology,  Division  of  Clinical  Sciences, Northern Ontario
                        School of Medicine, in which Dr. Golrokhian  Sani holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when Dr. Golrokhian Sani no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Golrokhian Sani's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee  makes  a  decision  about Dr. Golrokhian Sani's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following  consideration   of   the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on December 23, 2016, and expires on June 30,
                  2023.   Upon renewal of Dr. Golrokhian Sani's academic appointment at the
                  Northern  Ontario  School  of  Medicine, the expiry date can be extended,
                  subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.