Gomes, Megan Melissa (CPSO#: 90945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: Arnold Gomes, Megan Melissa (used until: 14 Mar 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205-1355 Bank St
Ottawa, ON
K1H 8K7
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: 613-721-2907
Fax: 6135186555
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Megan Gomes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gomes ( CPSO# 90945 )

Business Address:
205 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 721-2907

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN MELISSA GOMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2015