Gomez Hernandez, Karen Ester (CPSO#: 96285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  29 Nov 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Costa Rica, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue, Suite 413-7
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4437
Fax: (416) 586-8861
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Elizabeth Street, EN 12-211
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-3558
Fax: (416) 340-3314
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Costa Rica

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 30 Nov 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 29 Nov 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Karen Ester Gomez Hernandez may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Endocrinology and Metabolism, University of Toronto, in
                        which Dr. Gomez Hernandez holds an academic appointment at the rank
                        of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or  when  Dr.  Gomez  Hernandez  no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon  the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Gomez Hernandez's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Gomez  Hernandez's
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  November  30,  2016.   In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not  extended  by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on November 29, 2023.