Gomez Lemus, Jose Alejandro (CPSO#: 85769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 28 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Pathology and Laboratory Medicine
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32956
Fax: (519) 663-2930
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Colombia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 15 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSE ALEJANDRO GOMEZ LEMUS may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF PATHOLOGY, UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. GOMEZ LEMUS holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. GOMEZ LEMUS may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. GOMEZ LEMUS no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. GOMEZ LEMUS no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. GOMEZ LEMUS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2012