Gonsalves, Carol Lucy (CPSO#: 77367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71059
Fax: (613) 737-8122
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 29 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL LUCY GONSALVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONSALVES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 2002 to 26 Apr 2002
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2002 to 15 Jan 2003
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 19 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2006 to 18 May 2007
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2005