Gonzalez, Patricia (CPSO#: 83951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 592-3949
Fax: (905) 336-9632
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia Gonzalez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Gonzalez ( CPSO# 83951 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 592-3949

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA GONZALEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 25 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2006 to 03 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 03 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008