Gonzalez Porras, Maria Cecilia (CPSO#: 78446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Del Norte, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NHS Welland County General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 732-6111 Ext. 3375
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Visbal Amador & Gonzalez Porras Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA CECILIA GONZALEZ PORRAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ PORRAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2002 to 28 Feb 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2009