Gonzalez Pupo, Rafael Angel (CPSO#: 87587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
402 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-5937
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rafael Gonzalez Pupo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gonzalez Pupo ( CPSO# 87587 )

Business Address:
608-89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAFAEL ANGEL GONZALEZ PUPO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ PUPO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 21 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016