Gonzalez Romulus, Marie-Christina (CPSO#: 92611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Laval University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queesnway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-CHRISTINA GONZALEZ ROMULUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ ROMULUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Mar 2010 to 11 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2010 to 26 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2016