Gonzalez, Silvio Arquimedes (CPSO#: 81934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
Paediatric Emergency Department
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St Joseph's Health Center
Paediatric Department
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
Paediatric Department
327 Reynolds St.
Oakville ON  L6J 3L7
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gonzalez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gonzalez ( CPSO# 81934 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Business Address:
St. Joseph Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 630-6000

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SILVIO ARQUIMEDES GONZALEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 19 Nov 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011