Gonzalez-Almeyda, Roberto (CPSO#: 86416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Phone: (519) 322-1300
Fax: (519) 322-1322
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Erie Shores health care
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Gonzalez-Almeyda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gonzalez-Almeyda ( CPSO# 86416 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
197 Talbot West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERTO GONZALEZ-ALMEYDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONZALEZ-ALMEYDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2009