Good, Angela Matthew (CPSO#: 80808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Marys Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-749-6910
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
K-W Health Centre
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-3611
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Good Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Good ( CPSO# 80808 )

Business Address:
St. Marys Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6910

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Nov 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA MATTHEW GOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006