Goodall, Simon Crispin Piers (CPSO#: 56236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Oct 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
103859 Southgate Rd 10
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L0
Phone: (519) 323-0031
Fax: (519) 323-0031
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Goodall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Goodall ( CPSO# 56236 )

Business Address:
103859 Southgate Road 10
Mount Forest ON  N0G 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 323-0031

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 24, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Simon Crispin Piers
            Goodall , in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Goodall to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. SIMON CRISPIN PIERS GOODALL
                                          ("Dr. Goodall")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Goodall, certificate of registration number 56236, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that following a public complaint that raised
                  concerns about my standard of practice in my general practice, I
                  underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice with
                  respect to medical record-keeping. The reassessment report subsequently
                  received by the College raised concerns about my standard of practice
                  with respect to medical record-keeping.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        at least four (4) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks to review
                              at least ten (10) of my patient charts. Thereafter, if the
                              Clinical Supervisor recommends it and the College approves,
                              meetings will take place once every month, during which the
                              Clinical Supervisor will review at least twenty (20) of my
                              patient charts.  If fewer charts are available for review
                              during any visit, all charts will be reviewed by the Clinical
                              Supervisor.  In the event that I do not have any shifts in a
                              given calendar month, there will be no meeting with the
                              Clinical Supervisor for that calendar month. In that
                              circumstance, I will provide the Clinical Supervisor with
                              advance notice 14 days prior to the start of the calendar
                              month that no meeting will be required.  Clinical Supervision
                              will continue until the Clinical Supervisor has reviewed at
                              least eighty (80) of my patient charts;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor dated
                        August 11, 2017, and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   the following programs, or if those are unavailable,
                              equivalent programs satisfactory to the College:
                  
                              1.    Documentation: Review Charting Medical Records
                                    eLearning Module (CMPA);
                  
                              2.    Documentation II: Principles of Medical Record Keeping
                                    eLearning Module (CMPA);
                  
                        (ii)  a review and 2,000 word typed summary of College Policy
                              #4-12: Medical Records; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake to complete the Professional Education
                        listed in section (6)(a)(ii) above within three (3) months of
                        signing this Undertaking and the Professional Education listed in
                        sections (6)(a)(i) and (6)(a)(iii)  above as soon as possible.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake that, immediately after the completion of
                        the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5) above and Appendix
                        "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics and offices, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodall, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goodall, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register
                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Following a public complaint that raised concerns about his
                        standard of practice in his general practice, Dr. Goodall underwent
                        remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice with
                        respect to medical record-keeping. The reassessment report
                        subsequently received by the College raised concerns about Dr.
                        Goodall's standard of practice with respect to medical
                        record-keeping.  As a result:
                  
                        Dr. Goodall will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least four months. 
                  
                        Dr. Goodall will engage in professional education in medical record
                        keeping.
                  
                        Dr. Goodall's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected
                        by the College after the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goodall, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Goodall, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Goodall, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
            (18)  I, Dr. Goodall, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking; 
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 24, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Simon Crispin Piers Goodall to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 24, 2018:

Following a public complaint that raised concerns about his standard of practice in his general practice, Dr. Goodall underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice with respect to medical record-keeping. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about Dr. Goodall’s standard of practice with respect to medical record-keeping. As a result:

Dr. Goodall will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least four months.

Dr. Goodall will engage in professional education in medical record keeping.

Dr. Goodall’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College after the period of Clinical Supervision.