Goodarzi, Masoud Eftekhari (CPSO#: 83068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Tagalog

Education:Far Eastern University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6055 Main St.
Niagara Falls ON  L2A 6A1
Phone: (289) 296-6880
Fax: (289) 296-8876
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Goodarzi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goodarzi ( CPSO# 83068 )

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2

Business Address:
6055 Main Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 6A1
Phone Number: (289) 296-6880

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MASOUD EFTEKHARI GOODARZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODARZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010