Gooderham, Melinda Jennifer (CPSO#: 73998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Skin Centre for Dermatology
775 Monaghan Road South
Peterborough ON  K9J 5K2
Phone: (705) 775-7546
Fax: (705) 775-3376
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melinda Gooderham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gooderham ( CPSO# 73998 )

Business Address:
775 Monaghan Road
Peterborough ON  K9J 5K2
Phone Number: (705) 775-7546

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELINDA JENNIFER GOODERHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODERHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2004