Goodrow, Gwendolyn Joy (CPSO#: 70139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Tiffin, Gwendolyn Joy (used until: 25 Jun 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3
Phone: (905) 816-9822
Fax: (905) 816-9833
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Goodrow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Goodrow ( CPSO# 70139 )

Business Address:
Isis Regional Fertility Centre
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3
Phone Number: (905) 816-9822

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 26 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 26 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 26, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gwendolyn Joy Goodrow,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Goodrow has given to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                           ("Undertaking") 
                                                  of
                                         DR. GWENDOLYN GOODROW
                                           ("Dr. Goodrow") 
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College; "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Goodrow, certificate of registration number 70139, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215688 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my obstetric and
                  gynaecology practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of six (6) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:
                  
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Directly supervise at least ten (10) hysteroscopic myomectomy
                              and/or uterine resection procedures, and assess the
                              appropriateness of the surgery, my procedure technique, and
                              my fluid balance management;
                  
                        (iv)  If fewer than ten (10) procedures described in section
                              5(b)(iii) above are available to be supervised within six (6)
                              months, directly supervise all procedures described in
                              section 5(b)(iii) for up to an additional four (4) months,
                              until at least ten (10) procedures have been directly
                              supervised;
                  
                        (v)   Review the patient charts for all observed procedures, and
                              maintain a log of all patient charts reviewed, including
                              outcomes and patient identifiers, and indicating whether Dr.
                              Goodrow exhibits the knowledge, skill, and judgment to
                              perform this procedure;
                  
                        (vi)  Discuss any concerns arising from the observed procedures;
                  
                        (vii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (viii)Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (ix)  Submit written reports to the College after each observed
                              procedure, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                              has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that the procedures to be observed
                        shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                        educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.



                  (e)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake to complete the requirements of the
                        Clinical Supervision within ten (10) months of the date I execute
                        this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(f) and/or
                        (g) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(h) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a written review of:
                  
                              1.    The Management of Uterine Leiomyomas (SOGC Clinical
                                    Practice Guideline); and
                  
                              2.    The College Policy on Medical Record-Keeping; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  
                  
            (7)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goodrow, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)"). I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of
                        the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard. I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.

                  (e)   I, Dr. Goodrow, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Goodrow, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code:
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Goodrow engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in her obstetrics and gynaecology practice. As a
                              result of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Goodrow will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
            Supervisor        acceptable to the College for a minimum of 6 months.
                                    
                              Dr. Goodrow will engage in professional education in medical
                              record-keeping and the management of uterine leiomyomas.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Goodrow, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Goodrow, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Goodrow, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Goodrow, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or

                  (d)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 26, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gwendolyn Goodrow to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 26, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Goodrow engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her obstetrics and gynaecology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Goodrow will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of 6 months.

Dr. Goodrow will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping and the management of uterine leiomyomas.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)