Goodwin, Rachel Anne (CPSO#: 79663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road, Box 911
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70185
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Goodwin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goodwin ( CPSO# 79663 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Regional
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Dec 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL ANNE GOODWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODWIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 13 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2006 to 18 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2006 to 18 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2007 to 18 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 28 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2010 to 06 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007