Gopalapillai, Salini (CPSO#: 95820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Peel Family Health Team
Suite 301
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: 905 791-5822
Fax: 905 791-5493
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Salini Gopalapillai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gopalapillai ( CPSO# 95820 )

Business Address:
North Peel Family Health Team
Suite 301
18 Kensington Avenue
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 791-5822

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALINI GOPALAPILLAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOPALAPILLAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Queen's University, 01 Dec 2013 to 24 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013