Gordon, Richard Shawn (CPSO#: 73823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1258 West Bay Drive
Suite D
Largo FL  33770
United States
Phone: (727) 586-3751

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD SHAWN GORDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2006