Gorguy, Nermine (CPSO#: 91158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emerald Park Medical
Unit #301
4750 Yonge St.
North York ON  M2N 0J6
Phone: 416 733 4535
Fax: 416 733 4533
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Gorguy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Gorguy ( CPSO# 77164 )
Dr. N. Gorguy ( CPSO# 91158 )

Business Address:
600 - 2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 208-7318

Business Address:
301 - 4750 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 0J6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NERMINE GORGUY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORGUY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011