Goscimski, Jacqueline (CPSO#: 93909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5502
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Goscimski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Goscimski ( CPSO# 93909 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE GOSCIMSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSCIMSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011