Gostelow, Marcus (CPSO#: 96177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3932-B Keele St
Intersection of Keele/Finch
Toronto
Toronto ON  M3J 1N8
Phone: (416) 630-2111
Fax: (416) 630-7843
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1415 Kennedy Rd, Unit 19
Scarborough ON  M1P2L6
Canada
Phone: 647-349-1270
Fax: 647-349-1271
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCUS GOSTELOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSTELOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2014