Gottlieb, Sidney Otto (CPSO#: 85625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Emory University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone: (705) 444-1648
Fax: (705) 444-1909
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

95 Bayly St W.
Suite 305
Ajax ON  L1S7K8
Canada
Phone: 905 686-3211
Fax: 905 686-8564
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

JeeJeebhoy Heart Clinic
164 Queen Street E.
Brampton ONL6V1B4
Brampton ON  L6W 3W8
Canada
Phone: (905) 451-0185
Fax: (905) 451-4743
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Ontario Cardiology Services
6870 Goreway Drive
Unit 101
Malton ON  L4T 4J2
Canada
Phone: (905) 673-1756
Fax: (905) 673-1759
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sidney Gottlieb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gottlieb ( CPSO# 85625 )

Business Address:
209 - 164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 451-0185

Business Address:
Suite 201
1 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 444-1648

Business Address:
6870 Goreway Drive
Suite 101
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone Number: (905) 673-1756

Business Address:
305 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 686-3211

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - Georgia
USA - Idaho
USA - Indiana
USA - Maryland
USA - Minnesota
USA - New Jersey
USA - New York
USA - North Carolina
USA - Oklahoma
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 May 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 May 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIDNEY OTTO GOTTLIEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOTTLIEB is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2008