Gottman, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 88397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8660
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1111 Rue Ghislain
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Canada
Phone: (613) 632-1111
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 567-5251
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gottman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Gottman ( CPSO# 88397 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE GOTTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOTTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010