Goulet, Benoit (CPSO#: 75543)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: French

Education:Laval University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2002