Goure, Camille Alphonse Joseph (CPSO#: 84767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Goure Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Goure ( CPSO# 84767 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMILLE ALPHONSE JOSEPH GOURE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOURE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011