Govindarajulu, Arun Prasad (CPSO#: 85866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McLaughlin 2 405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2002
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PRINCES MARGARET HOSPITAL
DEPT OF ANESTHESIA
610 UNIVERSITY AVENUE
Toronto ON  M5T 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4757
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

WOMENS COLLEGE HOSPITAL
76 Grenville St,
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 6269
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Lasik Centre
Suite#212, 2345, Yonge street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E5
Canada
Phone: 4167332020
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.P. Govindarajulu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Govindarajulu ( CPSO# 85866 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Operating Room
Toronto ON  M5T 2C1
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McLaughlin 2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Operating Room
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Business Address:
212 - 2345 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 733-2020

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARUN PRASAD GOVINDARAJULU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOVINDARAJULU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 09 Feb 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011