Gower, Sarah Kathryn (CPSO#: 75018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Geddes Medical Group
1st Floor
143 Metcalfe Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: (519) 846-2224
Fax: (519) 846-2005
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gower Kapasi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gower ( CPSO# 75018 )
Dr. H. Kapasi ( CPSO# 74994 )

Business Address:
801 St. David Street
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
Geddes Medical Group
143 Metcalfe Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (519) 846-2224

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH KATHRYN GOWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOWER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2002