Gracey, Janel Louise (CPSO#: 89802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
686 Adelaide St N
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Phone: (519) 601-7171
Fax: (519) 601-7174
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

648 Huron st.
second floor
London ON  N5Y 4J8
Canada
Phone: 5194349191
Fax: 5194381167
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

475 Talbot St.
St Thomas ON  N5P 1C1
Canada
Phone: 5196319040
Fax: 5196319355
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02

475 Talbot St.
St Thomas ON  N5P 1C1
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-9040
Fax: (519) 631-9355
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. L. Gracey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gracey ( CPSO# 89802 )

Business Address:
685 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Phone Number: (519) 601-7171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANEL LOUISE GRACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRACEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009