Gradinger, Abigail (CPSO#: 95916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone: (416) 789-2449
Fax: (416) 789-2253
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Doctors on Call
#5-10 Meadowglen Drive
Whitby ON  L1R3P8
Canada
Phone: 647-872-9958
Fax: 647-872-9958
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABIGAIL GRADINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRADINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014