Grady, Deirdre Mary (CPSO#: 73035)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001