Graham, Janet Elaine (CPSO#: 54442)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Shahrzad Ghotbi 250 Dundas St E Waterdown ON L8R 0G5
Date Received: 18 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018