Graham, Martha Blair (CPSO#: 72274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 28
1495 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 0B2
Phone: (289) 291-0440
Fax: (289) 291-0442
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Oakville Health Centre
Suite 121
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Graham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Graham ( CPSO# 72274 )

Business Address:
28 - 1495 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 0B2
Phone Number: (289) 291-0440

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTHA BLAIR GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000