Graham, Susan Marie (CPSO#: 92098)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010