Grandbois, Michelle Marie Rebecca (CPSO#: 79654)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Sep 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE MARIE REBECCA GRANDBOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANDBOIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 24 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2004 to 13 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2005