Grande, Maria Soccorsa (CPSO#: 33305)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: Grandi, Maria Soccorsa (used until: 18 Feb 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Brock University Student Health Services 500 Glenridge Avenue St. Catharines ON L2S 3A1 Some medical records are also in the care of the following physicians: Dr. Preston Zuliani, and Dr. Geoffrey Sinton.
Date Received: 24 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018