Grant, Brian Robert (CPSO#: 88479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

797 Princess, Suite 500
Kingston Orthopaedic Pain Institute
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Canada
Phone: (613) 344-1202
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grant & Grant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Grant ( CPSO# 88479 )
Dr. A. Grant ( CPSO# 88258 )

Business Address:
Maple Key Clinic
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 546-9721

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
Queen's School of Medicine
18 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2544

Business Address:
Prince Edward County Memorial
403 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Business Address:
K.O.P.I.
Suite 500
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 344-1202

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 26 Aug 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN ROBERT GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 18 Aug 2009 to 17 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 18 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 15 Oct 2011 to 14 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 15 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2013