Grant, Carol Marie Robinson (CPSO#: 51695)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: Robinson, Carol Marie (used until: 05 Mar 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hospital for Sick Children 555 University Ave Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 03 Jul 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2018