Grant, Darrell William (CPSO#: 62792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brock University
Student Health Services
500 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone: (905) 688-5550 Ext. 4692
Fax: (905) 688-6448
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 Niagara Street North suite G1
Welland ON  L3C 5Z4
Canada
Phone: (905) 732-4451
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

6150 Valleyway Suite 104
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 1Y3
Canada
Phone: (905) 371-1881
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darrell Grant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Grant ( CPSO# 62792 )

Business Address:
104 - 6150 Valley Way
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 1Y3
Phone Number: (905) 371-1881

Business Address:
800 Niagara Street North
Welland ON  L2E 1Y3
Phone Number: (905) 732-4451

Business Address:
1485 Garrison Road
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1P8

Business Address:
1812 Sir Issac Brock Way
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone Number: (905) 688-5550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARRELL WILLIAM GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1990