Grant, Doris Janette (CPSO#: 20878)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doris J. Grant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018