Grant, Estee Christa (CPSO#: 74863)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: Marczinski, Estee Christa (used until: 20 Jun 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2005